Appendix 2
Public hearings and witnesses
Tuesday, 24 July 2007—Canberra
ELSLEY, Squadron Leader Ruth, Detachment Commander, 44
Wing Detachment, RAAF Base Williamtown
GILLESPIE, Lieutenant General Ken, Vice Chief
of the Defence Force
GRZESKOWIAK, Mr Steve, Director-General, Personnel Policy and Employment
Conditions, Department of Defence
JOHNSON, Mr Mark David,
National Manager, Compensation Policy, Department of Veterans’ Affairs
NAGY, Mr William Stephen, Director, United Nations Commitments and Support,
Department of Defence
PAGE, Mr Martin Leslie,
Assistant Director, VEA Compensation Policy, Department of Veterans’ Affairs
PARR, Mrs Sue, Acting Head, Personnel Executive, Department of
Defence
PEARCE, Mr Mal, Director-General, Occupational Health, Safety and
Compensation Branch, Department of Defence
SCOTT, Captain David Christian, Director, United Nations, Middle East and
Africa,
Department of Defence
SIMS, Brigadier
Andrew,
Director-General, Support, Headquarters Joint Operations Command, Department of
Defence
Wednesday, 25 July 2007—Canberra
BIRD, Ms Gillian, Deputy Secretary, Department of Foreign Affairs and
Trade
BLISS, Mr Michael Edward, Director, International Law Section, Department of
Foreign Affairs and Trade
CHAN, Ms Michelle, Assistant Secretary, South-East Asia (South) and
Regional Issues Branch, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
CHARTRES, Ms Alison,
Director, Fragile States, Australian Agency for International Development
DARVILL, Mr Steve, Humanitarian/Peace-Conflict Adviser, Australian
Agency for International Development
EDWARDS, Mr Bruce Kevin Jeffrey, Executive Officer,
Solomon Islands Section, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
HUTCHESSON, Mr Bryce David, Assistant Secretary, Strategic Affairs Branch,
Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
LANCASTER, Commander Steve, Manager Operations
Response Group, International Deployment Group, Australian Federal Police
MARCH, Mr Alan, Humanitarian Coordinator and Assistant Director
General, Public Affairs, Australian Agency for International Development
MURNEY, Dr Anthony, Manager, Planning and Development, International
Deployment Group, Australian Federal Police
POTTS, Mr Michael John, First Assistant Secretary, International
Organisations and Legal Division, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
RITCHIE, Mr David Alexander, First Assistant Secretary, Pacific Division,
Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
STOKES, Ms Deborah, First Assistant Secretary, South and West Asia, Middle East and
Africa
Division, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
WALTERS,
Assistant Commissioner Mark Adrian, National Manager, International Deployment
Group, Australian Federal Police
Monday, 20 August 2007—Sydney
CRAWFORD, Rear Admiral Ian McLean, National President, Australian Veterans and Defence Services
Council
FORD, Major
General Timothy Roger (Retired), Private capacity
GEE, Mr Alistair Patrick, Executive Director, Christian World Service
GOLDSMITH, Professor Andrew, School of Law, Flinders University
ROY, Ms Julia,
Responsibility to Protect Policy and Advocacy Officer, Christian World Service
THOMSON, Mr James D., Director,
Policy and Advocacy, Christian World Service
WAINWRIGHT, Associate
Professor Elsina Margaret, Private capacity
Tuesday, 21 August 2007—Melbourne
BROWN, Mr David James, Asia Manager, Australian Red Cross
COPELAND, Mr Paul Arthur,
National President, Australian Peacekeeper and Peacemaker Veterans’ Association
Inc.
DODD, Miss Rebecca, National Manager, International Humanitarian Law,
Australian Red Cross
ENSOR, Mr James, Director
of Public Policy, Oxfam Australia
GOW, Ms Melanie, Head, Advocacy, Program Effectiveness and Learning,
World Vision Australia
McCORMACK, Professor Timothy Lloyd Hearnden,
Director, Asia Pacific Centre for Military Law, Melbourne Law School
McINNES, Mr Wayne Andrew, Private capacity
PARRIS, Dr Brett, Senior Economic Adviser, World Vision Australia
ROSS, Mr Brendan,
Humanitarian Advocacy Coordinator, Oxfam Australia
SHEPHERD, Mr Geoffrey James, Head of Humanitarian and Emergency Affairs, World Vision
Australia
TICKNER, Mr Robert, Secretary General/Chief Executive Officer,
Australian Red Cross
Wednesday, 5 September 2007—Canberra
APTHORPE, Professor Raymond James, Private capacity
BREEN, Dr Bob, Research Fellow, Research School of Pacific and
Asian Studies, Australian National University
CLUNIES-ROSS, Major General Adrian,
Chairman, National Defence Committee, Returned and Services League of Australia
CONNOR, Dr John Stephen, Volume Author, Official History of Australian
Peacekeeping and Post-Cold War Operations
DOOLAN, Rear
Admiral Kenneth Allan (Retired), Member, National Defence Committee, Returned
and Services League of Australia
HORNER, Professor David Murray, Professor of Australian Defence History, Australian National University;
and Official Historian, Official History of Australian Peacekeeping and
Post-Cold War Operations
LONDEY, Dr Peter David, Military History Section, Australian War Memorial;
and Author, Official History of Australian Peacekeeping and Post-Cold War
Operations
MALEY, Mr Michael Charles, Director, International Services, Australian
Electoral Commission
PICKERING, Mr Tim, First
Assistant Commissioner, Electoral Operations, Australian Electoral Commission
PURNELL, Mr David Lyle, National Administrator, United Nations Association
of Australia
RAFALOWICZ, Mr Alex, National Vice President (Policy), United Nations
Youth Association of Australia
Thursday, 6 September 2008—Canberra
BURGESS, Mr
Mark Anthony, Chief Executive Officer, Police Federation of Australia
CROSSLEY, Mr David, Executive Director, Australian National Audit Office
GILLESPIE, Lieutenant General Ken, Vice Chief
of the Defence Force, Department of Defence
McKASKILL, Brigadier David, former Commandant,
Australian Defence Force Warfare Centre, Department of Defence
McLAUGHLIN, Commander Rob, Legal Adviser, Military Strategic Commitments,
Department of Defence.
MEERT, Mr John, Group Executive Director, Australian National Audit
Office
NAGY, Mr William, Director, United Nations Commitments and Support,
Department of Defence
O’BRIEN, Mr Timothy, Senior Director,
Australian National Audit Office
O’CALLAGHAN, Mr Paul,
Executive Director, Australian Council for International Development
ROWLANDS, Mr David, Acting Executive Director, Australian National Audit
Office
SCOTT, Captain David, Director, United Nations, Middle East and
Africa,
Department of Defence
SMITH, Major
General Michael G (Retired), Chief Executive Officer, Austcare
WEBBER, Mr Norman Alan, National Research, United Nations Police Association
of Australia.
WENDT, Ms Neva, Senior Policy Adviser, Australian Council for International
Development
Thursday, 13 September 2007—Canberra
BLISS, Mr Michael Edward, Director, International Law Section, Department of
Foreign Affairs and Trade
BRAITHWAITE, Professor John, Centre for International
Governance and Justice, Regulatory Institutions Network, Australian National University
CHAN, Ms Michelle, Assistant Secretary, South-East Asia (South) and
Regional Issues Branch, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
CHARLESWORTH, Professor Hilary, Director, Centre for International Governance and Justice,
Regulatory Institutions Network, Australian National University
EDWARDS, Mr Bruce Kevin Jeffrey, Executive Officer,
Solomon Islands Section, Pacific Islands Branch, Pacific Division, Department
of Foreign Affairs and Trade
FARRALL, Dr Jeremy Matam, Research Fellow, Centre for International Governance
and Justice, Regulatory Institutions Network, Australian National University
FEAKES, Mr Richard, Director, Solomon Islands Section,
Pacific Islands Branch, Pacific Division, Department of Foreign Affairs and
Trade
FOLEY, Mr Paul, Assistant Secretary, Middle East and Africa Branch,
Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
LOCHRIN, Mr Adrian Robert, Acting Assistant Secretary, Strategic Affairs
Branch, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
POTTS, Mr Michael John, First Assistant Secretary, International
Organisations and Legal Division, Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
Navigation: Previous Page | Contents | Next Page