Members of the Committee
Core Members
Senator
Mark Bishop, ALP, WA (Chair) (elected Chair on 14 February 2008)
Senator Russell Trood, LP, QLD (Deputy Chair) (elected
Deputy Chair on 14 February 2008)
Senator Mathias Cormann, LP, WA (from 17 August 2007)
Senator David Feeney, ALP, VIC (from 1 July 2008)
Senator Michael Forshaw, ALP, NSW
Senator Helen Kroger, LP, VIC (from 1 July 2008)
Senator Anne McEwen,
ALP, SA (from 12 February 2008)
Former Members
Senator John Hogg, ALP, QLD (until 30 June 2008)
Senator Steve Hutchins,
ALP, NSW (Deputy Chair) (until 11 February 2008)
Senator the Hon. Sandy Macdonald, NATS, NSW (from 12 February 2008 until 30 June 2008)
Senator Marise Payne,
LP, NSW (Chair) (until 11 February 2008)
Senator Alan
Ferguson, LP, SA (until 14 August 2007)
Secretariat
Dr Kathleen Dermody,
Committee Secretary
Dr Timothy Kendall,
Principal Research Officer (from 3 March 2008)
Ms Lisa Fenn,
Principal Research Officer (until 15 February 2008)
Dr Greg Spelman,
Principal Research Officer (8 February 2007–16 May 2007)
Dr Andrew Gaczol,
Principal Research Officer (9 August 2007–14 December 2007)
Ms Erja Vanhalakka-Stephenson,
Senior Research Officer
Ms Jenene James,
Research Officer
Ms Angela Lancsar,
Executive Assistant
Contact
Senate Standing Committees on Foreign Affairs, Defence and Trade
PO Box 6100
Parliament House
Canberra ACT 2600
Australia
Phone: +61 2
6277 3535
Fax: +61 2
6277 5818
Email: fadt.sen@aph.gov.au
Internet: www.aph.gov.au/Senate/committee/fadt_ctte/index.htm
Navigation: Contents | Next Page