MEMBERSHIP OF THE COMMITTEE
Members |
Senator Glenn Lazarus, Chair, IND, QLD |
Senator the Hon Joseph Ludwig, Deputy Chair, ALP, QLD |
Senator Christopher (Chris) Ketter, ALP, QLD |
Senator the Hon Ian Macdonald, LP, QLD |
Senator Larissa Waters, AG, QLD |
Participating
Members
Senator Chris
Back, LP, WA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Cory Bernardi,
LP, SA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Catryna Bilyk,
ALP, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Carol Brown,
ALP, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Joseph
(Joe) Bullock, ALP, WA, (from 17 November 2014)
Senator David Bushby,
LP, TAS (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon
Douglas (Doug) Cameron, ALP, NSW (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Matthew Canavan,
NP, QLD (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon
Kim Carr, ALP, VIC (from 17 November 2014)
Senator the Hon
Jacinta Collins, ALP, VIC (from 17 November 2014)
Senator the Hon
Stephen Conroy, ALP, VIC (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Sam Dastyari,
ALP, NSW (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Sean Edwards,
LP, SA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon John
Faulkner, ALP, NSW
(from
17 November 2014 to 6 February 2015)
Senator David Fawcett,
LP, SA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Alexander
(Alex) Gallacher, ALP, SA (from 17 November 2014)
Senator the Hon
William (Bill) Heffernan, LP, NSW (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Jacqui Lambie,
IND, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Sue
Lines, ALP, WA (from 17 November 2014)
Senator the Hon
Kate Lundy, ALP, ACT (from
17 November 2014 to 24 March 2015)
Senator Gavin Marshall,
ALP, VIC (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Anne McEwen,
ALP, SA (from 17 November 2014)
Senator James McGrath,
LP, QLD (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Bridget McKenzie,
NP, VIC (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon
Jan McLucas, ALP, QLD (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Claire Moore,
ALP, QLD (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Deborah O'Neill,
ALP, NSW (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Barry O'Sullivan,
NP, QLD (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Nova Peris
OAM, ALP, NT (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Helen Polley,
ALP, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Linda Reynolds,
LP, WA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Anne Ruston,
LP, SA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Zdenko
(Zed) Seselja, LP, ACT (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon Lisa
Singh, ALP, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Dean Smith,
ALP, WA (from 1 October 2014)
Senator Glenn Sterle,
ALP, WA (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Anne Urquhart,
ALP, TAS (from 17 November 2014)
Senator Zhenya Wang,
PUP, WA (from 17 November 2014)
Senator John Williams,
NP, NSW (from 1 October 2014)
Senator the Hon Penny
Wong, ALP, SA (from 17 November 2014)
Secretariat
Ms Julia
Agostino, Secretary
Ms Natasha
Rusjakovski, Acting Principal Research Officer
Ms Jessica
Strout, Acting Senior Research Officer
Ms Elise
Williamson, Research Officer (until 2 February 2015)
Ms Chiara
Edwards, Research Officer (from 2 February 2015)
Ms Sophie
Wolfer, Administrative Officer
PO Box 6100
Parliament House
Canberra ACT 2600
Ph:
02 6277 3521
Fax: 02 6277 5706
E-mail:
eec.sen@aph.gov.au
Navigation: Contents | Next Page