Members of the Committee
Members
Senator Fiona Nash |
NAT, New
South Wales |
Chair (from 14 May 2009)
Appointed
to committee on 12 March 2009
|
Senator Glenn Sterle |
ALP,
Western Australia |
Chair (to 14 May 2009)
Deputy
Chair (from 14 May 2009) |
Senator Christine Milne* |
AG,
Tasmania |
Deputy
Chair (to 14 May 2009) |
Senator the Hon. Bill Heffernan |
LP, New
South Wales |
|
Senator Annette Hurley |
ALP,
South Australia |
Discharged
from committee on 5 February 2009 |
Senator Steve Hutchins |
ALP, New
South Wales |
Discharged
from committee on 14 May 2009 |
Senator Don Farrell |
ALP,
South Australia |
Appointed
to the committee on 5 February 2009
Discharged
from committee on 14 May 2009 |
Senator Julian McGauran** |
LP,
Victoria |
|
Senator Kerry O'Brien*** |
ALP,
Tasmania |
|
Senator John Williams |
NAT, New
South Wales |
Discharged
from committee on 14 May 2009 |
Substitute Members
* |
Senator
Rachel Siewert, AG, Western Australia, replaced Senator Christine Milne for
this inquiry. |
** |
Senator
Mary-Jo Fisher, LP, South Australia, replaced Senator Julian McGauran for this
inquiry. |
*** |
Senator
Don Farrell, ALP, South Australia, replaced Senator O'Brien for the period 15
September 2008 to 12 December 2008. |
Participating Members
Senator
Simon Birmingham |
LP, South Australia |
|
Senator Nick
Xenophon |
Ind, South Australia |
|
Committee Secretariat
Ms Jeanette Radcliffe |
Secretary |
Ms Ann
Palmer |
Principal Research Officer |
Mr Peter
Short |
Principal Research Officer |
Ms Maria
Sarelas |
Executive Assistant |
Ms Rosalind
McMahon |
Executive Assistant |
Parliament
House, Canberra
Navigation: Contents | Next Page