Members of the Committee
Members
Senator Glenn Sterle |
ALP, Western
Australia |
Chair |
Senator Christine Milne |
AG,
Tasmania |
Deputy Chair |
Senator the Hon. Bill Heffernan |
LP, New
South Wales |
|
Senator Steve Hutchins |
ALP, New
South Wales |
|
Senator Annette Hurley |
ALP, South
Australia |
|
Senator Julian McGauran |
LP, Victoria |
|
Senator
John Williams |
NATS, New South Wales (appointed 24 September 2008) |
|
Senator Don Farrell |
ALP,
South Australia (appointed 15 September 2008) |
|
*Senator Siewert,
AG Western Australia, was Deputy Chair of the Committee from 13 February.2008 to 23 August 2008
*Senator
O'Brien, ALP Tasmania, was replaced by Senator Farrell for the period 15 September 2008 to 12 December 2008
*Senator Nash, NATS New South Wales, was discharged from the
Committee, 24 September 2008
Participating Member
Senator Mary Jo Fisher |
LP,
South Australia |
|
Committee
Secretariat
Ms Jeanette Radcliffe, Secretary
Ms Ann Palmer, Principal
Research Officer
Ms Jenene James, Research
Officer
Ms Rosalind McMahon, Executive
Assistant
PO Box 6100
Parliament
House
Canberra ACT 2600
Telephone: (02)
6277 3511
Facsimile (02)
6277 5811
Internet: www.aph.gov.au/senate_rrat
Email: rrat.sen@aph.gov.au
Navigation: Contents | Next Page