Members of the committee
Members
Senator the Hon Ian Macdonald (LP, QLD) (Chair)
Senator
Jacinta Collins (ALP, VIC) (from 1.07.2014; Deputy Chair from 10.07.2014)
Senator Catryna Bilyk (ALP, TAS) (from 1.07.2014)
Senator Barry O'Sullivan (NATS, QLD) (from 1.07.2014)
Senator Linda Reynolds (LP, WA) (from 1.07.2014)
Senator Penny Wright (AG, SA)
Former Members
Senator Gavin
Marshall (ALP, VIC) (Deputy Chair to 24.02.2014 to 30.06.2014)
Senator the Hon Lisa Singh (ALP, TAS)
(Deputy Chair from 24.02.2014 to 30.06.2014)
Senator Sue Boyce (LP, QLD) (to 30.06.2014)
Senator Zed
Seselja (LP, ACT) (to 30.06.2014)
Participating
Members
Senator Nick Xenophon (IND, SA)
Secretariat
Ms Sophie
Dunstone, Committee Secretary
Mr CJ
Sautelle, Acting Principal Research Officer
Ms Jo-Anne
Holmes, Administrative Officer
Suite S1.61
Parliament
House
CANBERRA ACT
2600
Telephone: (02)
6277 3560
Fax: (02) 6277 5794
Email: legcon.sen@aph.gov.au
Navigation: Contents | Next Page