Friday, 17 February 2017—Canberra
Air Power Australia
Mr Peter Goon, Head of Test and Evaluation
Dr Carlo Kopp, Head of Capability and Strategic Research
Strategic Forum Ltd
Dr Ross Babbage, Chief Executive Officer and Non-Resident Senior Fellow, Center for Strategic and Budgetary Assessments, Washington DC
National Security College, Australian National University
Dr David Brewster, Senior Research Fellow
Professor Rory Medcalf, Head of College
Department of Defence
Mr Tom Hamilton, First Assistant Secretary, Strategic Policy Division
Major General Gus Gilmore, Head, Military Strategic Commitments Division
Department of Foreign Affairs and Trade
Ms Kathy Klugman, First Assistant Secretary, South and West Asia Division
Department of Infrastructure and Regional Development
Ms Vicki Middleton, Executive Director, Local Government and Territories Division
Ms Karly Pidgeon, General Manager, Indian Ocean Territories Branch
Department of Immigration and Border Protection
Dr Benjamin Evans, Assistant Secretary, Strategy Branch
Rear Admiral Peter Laver, Commander, Maritime Border Command
Private capacity
Thursday, 23 March 2017—Canberra
Future Directions International
Major General John Hartley AO (Retired), Institute Director
Private capacity
Tuesday, 4 April 2017—Christmas Island
Administrator of the Indian Ocean Territories
Australian Federal Police
Sergeant Steven Wiggins, Territory Controller, Shire of Christmas Island
Chinese Literary Association of Christmas Island
Christmas Island Casino Resort
Mr Michael Asims, Business Development Manager
Christmas Island Tourism Association
Mrs Kirsty Faulkner, Committee Member
Indian Ocean Group Training Association
Mr Daniel Becker, General Manager
Islamic Council of Christmas Island
Mr Gregory McIntosh, Chairman
Parks Australia
Mr Scott Suridge, Park Manager, Christmas Island and Pulu Keeling National Parks
Phosphate Resources Ltd
Mr Mark Brandon-Baker, Consultant
Shire of Christmas Island
Mr David Price, Chief Executive Officer
Mr Gordon Thomson, Shire President, and General Secretary, Union of Christmas Island Workers
Private capacity
Wednesday, 5 April 2017—West Island, Cocos (Keeling) Islands
Cocos Islands Cooperative Society Limited
Mr Ronald Grant, General Manager
Cocos (Keeling) Islands Community Resources Centre
Ms Kelly Edwards, Coordinator
Cocos (Keeling) Islands Tourism Association
Ms Stephanie Hagenbrock, Tourism Manager
Island Petroleum Services
Mr Geoffrey Bennett, Manager
Shire of Cocos (Keeling) Islands
Mr Aaron Bowman, Chief Executive Officer
Private capacity
Wednesday, 5 April 2017—Home Island, Cocos (Keeling) Islands
Cocos Islands Cooperative
Mrs Seriwati Iku, Project Manager
Persatuan Islam Pulu Cocos- Cocos Islands Islamic Association
Mr Mohammed Isa Minkom, President
Oceania House
Shire of the Cocos (Keeling) Islands
Mr Aaron Bowman, Chief Executive Officer
Mr Balmut Pirus, President
Ms Jeannette (Ayesha) Young, Shire Councillor
Private capacity
Mr Noom Semat (Nek Nang), through Mr Balmut Pirus, interpreter