Speakerships (bolded) and Chairs |
Disciplinary actions per Chair |
Disciplinary actions per Speakership |
Sitting Days per Speakership |
Disciplinary actions per sitting days |
Holder, Sir Frederick 9.5.1901–23.7.1909 |
2 |
2 |
791# |
.003 |
Salmon, Charles 28.7.1909–19.2.1910 |
0 |
0 |
74 |
.000 |
McDonald, Charles 1.7.1910–23.4.1913 |
6 |
6 |
249 |
.024 |
Johnson, William 9.7.1913–30.7.1914 |
5 |
5 |
108 |
.046 |
McDonald, Charles 8.10.1914–26.3.1917 |
3 |
4 |
147 |
.027 |
Dep Sp Chanter, John |
1 |
|
|
|
Johnson, William 14.6.1917–6.11.1922 |
7 |
18 |
433 |
.042 |
Chair/Dep Sp Chanter, John |
10 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Watkins, David |
1 |
|
|
|
Watt, William 28.2.1923–3.10.1925 |
2 |
6 |
171 |
.035 |
Temp Chair Bayley, James |
4 |
|
|
|
Groom, Sir Littleton 13.1.1926–16.9.1929 |
2 |
7 |
245 |
.029 |
Chair/Dep Sp Bayley, James |
5 |
|
|
|
Makin, Norman 20.11.1929–27.11.1931 |
14 |
25 |
206 |
.121 |
Chair/Dep Sp McGrath, David |
8 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Prowse, John |
1 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Crouch, Richard |
2 |
|
|
|
Mackay, George 17.2.1932–7.8.1934 |
5 |
14 |
154 |
.091 |
Chair Bell, George |
9 |
|
|
|
Bell, George 23.10.1934–27.8.1940 |
14 |
23 |
323 |
.071 |
Temp Chair Nairn, Walter |
1 |
|
|
|
Chair Prowse, John |
8 |
|
|
|
Nairn, Walter 20.11.1940–21.6.1943 |
0 |
4 |
140 |
.029 |
Dep Sp Martens, George |
1 |
|
|
|
Chair Prowse, John |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Prowse, John |
1 |
|
|
|
Rosevear, John 22.6.1943–31.10.1949 |
11 |
25 |
490 |
.051 |
Temp Chair Martens, George |
2 |
|
|
|
Chair Riordan, William |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Clark, Joseph |
8 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Burke, Thomas |
1 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Lazzarini, Hubert |
1 |
|
|
|
Cameron, Archie 22.2.1950–9.8.1956 |
28 |
42 |
424 |
.099 |
Chair, Dep Sp Adermann, Charles |
11 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp McLeay, John |
1 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Bowden, George |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Harrison, Eric |
1 |
|
|
|
McLeay, John 29.8.1956–31.10.1966 |
28 |
48 |
655 |
.073 |
Dep Sp, Temp Chair Lawrence, William |
4 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp, Chair, Temp Chair, Ag Sp Lucock, Philip |
12 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Chaney, Fred |
1 |
|
|
|
Chair Bowden, George |
2 |
|
|
|
Temp Chair Wight, Bruce |
1 |
|
|
|
Aston, William 21.2.1967–2.11.1972 |
14 |
18 |
387 |
.047 |
Dep Chair Hallett, John |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Drury, Edward |
2 |
|
|
|
Cope, James 27.2.1973–27.2.1975 |
19 |
28 |
155* |
.181 |
Dep Sp Jenkins, Dr Harry |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp, Chair Scholes, Gordon |
5 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Martin, Stephen |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Luchetti, Anthony |
1 |
|
|
|
Scholes, Gordon 27.2.1975–11.11.1975 |
2 |
6 |
61** |
.098 |
Dep Sp Berinson, Joe |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Innes, Urquhart |
3 |
|
|
|
Snedden, Billy 17.2.1976–4.2.1983 |
13 |
24 |
456 |
.053 |
Ag Sp Lucock, Philip |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp, Ag Sp Millar, Percy |
5 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Jarman, Alan |
2 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Giles, Geoffrey |
2 |
|
|
|
Jenkins, Dr Henry 21.4.1983–20.12.1985 |
14 |
16 |
167 |
.096 |
Ag Sp Johnson, Les |
1 |
|
|
|
Ag Sp Child, Joan |
1 |
|
|
|
Child, Joan 11.2.1986–28.8.1989 |
12 |
20 |
251 |
.080 |
Dep Sp, Ag Sp McLeay, Leo |
4 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Blanchard, Cecil |
3 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Rocher, Allan |
1 |
|
|
|
McLeay, Leo 29.8.1989–8.2.1993 |
16 |
22 |
191 |
.115 |
Ag Sp, Dep Sp Edwards, Ron |
5 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Scholes, Gordon |
1 |
|
|
|
Martin, Stephen 4.5.1993–29.1.1996 |
24 |
27 |
184 |
.147 |
Dep Sp Andrew, Neil |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Rocher, Allan |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Jenkins, Harry |
1 |
|
|
|
Halverson, Robert 30.4.1996–3.3.1998 |
51 |
55 |
139 |
.396 |
Dep Sp Nehl, Garry |
3 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Truss, Warren |
1 |
|
|
|
Sinclair, Ian 4.3.1998–31.8.1998 |
16 |
18 |
37 |
.486 |
Dep Sp Quick, Harry |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Nehl, Garry |
1 |
|
|
|
Andrew, Neil 10.11.1998–31.8.2004 |
192 |
220 |
406 |
.542 |
Dep Sp Causley, Ian |
20 |
|
|
|
Ag Sp Nehl, Garry |
7 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Price, Roger |
1 |
|
|
|
Hawker, David 16.11.2004–17.10.2007 |
188 |
223 |
196 |
1.138 |
Dep Sp Causley, Ian |
35 |
|
|
|
Jenkins, Harry 12.2.2008–24.11.2011 |
252 |
265 |
256 |
1.035 |
Dep Sp Burke, Anna |
5 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Slipper, Peter |
6 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Scott, Bruce |
1 |
|
|
|
Dep Sp Bird, Sharon |
1 |
|
|
|
Slipper, Peter 24.11.2011–9.10.2012 |
67 |
115 |
54 |
2.130 |
Dep Sp Burke, Anna |
48 |
|
|
|
Burke, Anna 9.10.2012–12.8.2013 |
66 |
66 |
44 |
1.500 |
Total |
1,352 |
1,352 |
7,611 |
.178 |