Speaker
|
Term
|
Child, the Hon. Joan
|
11.2.1986–5.6.1987
14.9.1987–28.8.1989
|
McLeay, the Hon. Leo Boyce
|
29.8.1989–22.12.1989
8.5.1990–8.2.1993
|
Martin, the Hon. Stephen Paul
|
4.5.1993–29.1.1996
|
Halverson, the Hon. Robert George
|
30.4.1996–3.3.1998
|
Sinclair, the Rt Hon. Ian McCahon
|
4.3.1998–31.8.1998
|
Andrew, the Hon. John Neil
|
10.11.1998–8.10.2001
12.2.2002–31.8.2004
|
Hawker, the Hon. David Peter Maxwell
|
16.11.2004–17.10.2007 (with the authority to act as Speaker between date of dissolution on 17.10.07 and date of election of successor on 12.2.08)
|
Jenkins, Harry Alfred
|
12.2.2008–24.11.11
|
Slipper, the Hon Peter
|
24.11.2011–9.10.2012
|
Burke, Anna
|
9.10.2012–5.8.2013
|
Bishop, the Hon. Bronwyn |
12.11.2013 ̶ 2.8.2015 |
Smith, the Hon. Tony |
10.08.15– |