Governors-General
|
Period of service and career background
|
Hopetoun, 7th Earl of, the Rt Hon. John Adrian Louis Hope,
KT, GCMG, GCVO (later 1st Marquess of Linlithgow). Died 29.2.1908.
|
1.1.1901 - 9.1.1903
Colonial Governor
|
Tennyson, 2nd Baron, the Rt Hon. Hallam Tennyson, GCMG.
Died 2.12.1928.
|
9.1.1903 - 21.1.1904
State Governor
|
Northcote, 1st Baron, the Rt Hon. Henry Stafford
Northcote, GCMG, GCIE, CB. Died 29.9.1911.
|
21.1.1904 - 9.9.1908
Politics
|
Dudley, 2nd Earl of, the Rt Hon. William Humble Ward, GCB,
GCMG, GCVO. Died 29.6.1932.
|
9.9.1908 - 31.7.1911
Politics
|
Denman, 3rd Baron, the Rt Hon. Thomas Denman, GCMG, KCVO.
Died 24.6.1954.
|
31.7.1911 - 18.5.1914
Politics
|
Munro Ferguson, the Rt Hon. Sir Ronald Craufurd, GCMG
(later 1st Viscount Novar). Died 30.3.1934.
|
18.5.1914 - 6.10.1920
Politics
|
Forster, 1st Baron, the Rt Hon. Henry William Forster,
GCMG. Died 15.1.1936.
|
6.10.1920 - 8.10.1925
Politics
|
Stonehaven, 1st Baron, the Rt Hon. John Lawrence Baird,
GCMG, DSO
(later 1st Viscount Stonehaven). Died 20.8.1941.
|
8.10.1925 - 22.1.1931
Politics
|
Isaacs, the Rt Hon. Sir Isaac Alfred, GCB, GCMG, KC. Died
11.2.1948.
|
22.1.1931 - 23.1.1936
Politics; Law
|
Gowrie, 1st Baron, Brigadier General the Rt Hon. Alexander
Gore Arkwright Hore-Ruthven, VC, GCMG, CB, DSO (later 1st Earl of Gowrie of
Canberra and Dirleton). Died 2.5.1955.
|
23.1.1936 - 30.1.1945
Military; State Governor
|
Gloucester, Duke of, Earl of Ulster and Baron Culloden,
HRH Prince Henry William Frederick Albert, KG, KT, KP, GCB, GCMG, GCVO. Died
10.6.1974.
|
30.1.1945 - 11.3.1947
Royalty
|
McKell, the Rt Hon. Sir William John, GCMG, QC. Died
11.1.1985.
|
11.3.1947 - 8.5.1953
Politics
|
Slim, Field Marshal Sir William Joseph, KG, GCB, GCMG,
GCVO, GBE, DSO, MC (later 1st Viscount Slim). Died 14.12.1970.
|
8.5.1953 - 2.2.1960
Military
|
Dunrossil, 1st Viscount, the Rt Hon. William Shepherd
Morrison, GCMG, MC, QC. Died in office 3.2.1961.
|
2.2.1960 - 3.2.1961
Politics
|
De L'Isle, 1st Viscount, 6th Baron De L'Isle and Dudley,
the Rt Hon.
William Philip Sidney, VC, KG, GCMG, GCVO. Died 5.4.1991.
|
3.8.1961 - 22.9.1965
Politics
|
Casey, Baron, the Rt Hon. Richard Gardiner Casey, KG,
GCMG, CH, DSO, MC. Died 17.6.1976.
|
22.9.1965 - 30.4.1969
Politics
|
Hasluck, the Rt Hon. Sir Paul Meernaa Caedwalla, KG, GCMG,
GCVO. Died 9.1.1993.
|
30.4.1969 - 11.7.1974
Politics
|
Kerr, the Rt Hon. Sir John Robert, AK, GCMG, GCVO, QC.
Died 24.3.1991.
|
11.7.1974 - 8.12.1977
Law
|
Cowen, the Rt Hon. Sir Zelman, AK, GCMG, GCVO, QC. Died
8.12.2011.
|
8.12.1977 - 29.7.1982
Law; university administration
|
Stephen, the Rt Hon. Sir Ninian Martin, KG, AK, GCMG,
GCVO, KBE, QC.
|
29.7.1982 - 16.2.1989
Law
|
Hayden, the Hon. William George, AC.
|
16.2.1989 - 16.2.1996
Politics
|
Deane, the Hon. Sir William Patrick, AC, KBE.
|
16.2.1996 - 29.6.2001
Law
|
Hollingworth, Right Reverend the Hon. Dr Peter John, AC,
OBE.
|
29.6.2001 - 29.5.2003*
Clergy
|
Jeffery, Major General the Hon. Michael, AC, AO (Mil),
CVO, MC (Retd).
|
11.8.2003 - 5.9.2008
Military; State Governor
|
Bryce, the Hon. Dame Quentin Alice Louise, AD, CVO.
|
5.9.2008 - 28.3.2014
Law; State Governor
|
Cosgrove, General the Hon. Sir Peter John, AK, MC (Retd).
|
28.3.2014 –
Military
|