Members of the committee
Core members
Senator Chris Back,
LP, WA (Chair) (from 1 July 2014)
Senator Alex
Gallacher, ALP, SA (Deputy Chair) (from 1 July 2014)
Senator Alan
Eggleston, LP, WA (Chair) (until 30 June 2014)
Senator the Hon Ursula Stephens (Deputy Chair), ALP, NSW
(until 30 June 2014)
Senator Sean
Edwards, LP, SA (until 1 July 2014)
Senator David
Fawcett, LP, SA
Senator Scott Ludlam, AG, WA (from 7 July 2014)
Senator Anne
McEwen, ALP, SA
Senator James McGrath, LNP, QLD (from 1 July 2014)
Senator Peter Whish-Wilson, AG, TAS (until 7 July 2014)
Participating members who
contributed to the inquiry
Senator Whish-Wilson, AG, TAS (from 7 July 2014)
Substitute Member
Senator Whish-Wilson replaced Senator Ludlam for the
committee's public hearing on 6 August 2014.
Secretariat
Mr David Sullivan,
Committee Secretary
Mr Owen Griffiths,
Principal Research Officer
Ms Shennia
Spillane, Senior Research Officer
Ms Penny Bear,
Research Officer
Mr Joshua Wrest,
Administrative Officer
Senate Foreign Affairs,
Defence and Trade Committee
Department of the
Senate
PO Box 6100
Parliament House
Canberra ACT 2600
Australia
Phone: + 61 2
6277 3535
Fax: + 61 2
6277 5818
Email: fadt.sen@aph.gov.au
Navigation: Contents | Next Page