Biography
- Parliamentary service
-
- Elected to the House of Representatives for Braddon, Tasmania, 2004. Defeated at general elections, 2007.
- Committee service
-
- House of Representatives Standing: Publications served from 1.12.2004 to 17.10.2007; Employment, Workplace Relations and Workforce Participation served from 1.12.2004 to 17.10.2007
- Joint Statutory: Corporations and Financial Services served from 11.8.2005 to 17.10.2007
- Parliamentary party positions
-
- Liberal Party of Australia. Served: 09.10.2004 to 24.11.2007
- Party positions
-
- Member of the Liberal Party (Tas.) from 1999.
- Vice-President of Liberal Party local branch from 2001.
- Personal
-
- Born: 31.12.1958, Latrobe, Australia
- Gender: Male
- Marital Status: Single
- Qualifications and occupation before entering Federal Parliament
-
- Trade Certificate in Carpentry and Joinery.
- BEd (University of Tasmania).
- DipT (Tasmanian State Institute of Technology).
- Tasmanian Teachers' Certificate.
- Carpenter and joiner from 1975 to 1983.
- Secondary school teacher from 1986 to 1988.
- Business and financial consultant from 1988 to 2004.
- Electorate
-
- Name: Braddon
- Location: north-west Tasmania; it includes the cities of Burnie and Devonport, and the towns of Currie, Latrobe, Penguin, Port Sorell, Smithton, Stanley, Ulverstone, Waratah and Wynyard. It also includes King Island.
- Area: 11,760 Sq km
- Electors enrolled: 69,988 (at 9.10.2004)
- Industries: forestry, fishing, kelp harvesting, dairying, cheese, beef cattle production, vegetable growing and processing, poppies, pyrethrum, sawmills, paper mills, weaving mills, lead, zinc, iron ore, manufacturing, wind industry, telecommunications, ports, airports and tourism.
- Includes: Braddon is co-extensive with the Tasmanian House of Assembly electorate of the same name.