Saxe Bannister (also known as Sax Bannister) |
Selected for appointment October 1823;
Commission was dated 14 April 1824 on his arrival in NSW- 13 October 1826 |
William Henry Moore (acting) |
13.10.1826-31.7.1827 |
Alexander MacDuff Baxter |
1.8.1827-24.1.1831 |
William Henry Moore (acting) |
24.1.1831 (?) -24.6.1831 |
John Kinchela |
25.6.1831-18.4.1836 |
John Hubert Plunkett
|
19.4.1836-16.9.1836 (acting);
17.9.1836-5.6.1856;
25.8.1865-21.1. 1866
|
Sir William Montagu Manning
|
6.6.1856 - 25.8. 1856;
3.10.1856 - 25.5. 1857;
21.2. 8.3.1860;
31.10.1868 - 15.12. 1870
|
Sir James Martin
|
26.8.1856 - 2.10.1856;
7.9.1857 - 8.11. 1858;
16.10.1863 - 2.2. 1865;
22.1.1866 - 26.10. 1868;
16.12.1870 - 13.5. 1872
|
Sir John Bayley Darvall
|
26.5.1857 - 7.9.1857;
1.9.1863 - 15.10.1863;
3.2.1865 - 20.6.1865
|
Alfred James Peter Lutwyche
|
15.11.1858 - 28.2. 1859
|
Sir Lyttelton Holysake Bayley
|
1.3.1859 - 26.10. 1859
|
Edward Wise
|
27.10.1859 13.2. 1860
|
John Fletcher Hargrave
|
2.4.1860 31.7. 1863
|
Edward Butler
|
15.5.1872 10.11.1873
|
Sir Joseph George Long Innes
|
20.11.1873 8.2. 1875
|
William Bede Dalley
|
9.2.1875 21.3. 1877;
17.8.1877 17.12.1877;
5.1.1883 6.10. 1885
|
Sir William Charles Windeyer
|
22.3.1877 16.8.1877;
21.12.1878 10.8. 1879
|
William John Foster
|
18.12.1877 20.12. 1878;
20.1.1887 18.5.1887
|
Sir Robert Wisdom
|
13.8.1879 4.1.1 883
|
John Henry Want
|
7.10.1885 21.12.1885;
26.2.1886 19.1. 1887;
18.12.1894 4.4. 1898;
18.6.1898 18.4. 1899
|
Sir George Bowen Simpson
|
22.12.1885 25.2. 1886;
10.2.1888 16.1. 1889;
8.3.1889 22.10. 1891;
3.8.1894 1.12. 1894
|
Bernhard Ringrose Wise
|
27.5.1887 7.2.1888;
14.9.1899 14.6. 1904
|
Sir Edmund Barton
|
17.1.1889 7.3.1889;
23.10.1891 14.12. 1893
|
Charles Gilbert Heydon
|
15.12.1893 2.8. 1894
|
Sir George Houston Reid
|
19.4.1899 13.9. 1899
|
James Conley Gannon
|
15.6.1904 29.8.1904
|
Sir Charles Gregory Wade
|
30.8.1904 20.10.1910
|
William Arthur Holman
|
21.10.1910 29.1.1914
|
David Robert Hall
|
29.1.1914 23.7.1919
|
John Garland
|
23.7.1919 12.4.1920
|
Sir Edward Aloysius McTiernan
|
13.4.1920 20.12.1921;
20.12.1921-12.4.1922;
17.6.1925-26.5.1927
|
Sir Thomas Rainsford Bavin
|
20.12.1921;
13.4.1922 17.6.1925
|
Andrew Augustus Lysaght
|
27.5.1927 18.10.1927;
4.11.1930 16.6.1931
|
Francis Stewart Boyce
|
19.10.1927 3.11.1930
|
Joseph Lamaro
|
17.6.1931 13.5.1932
|
Sir Daniel Levy
|
16.5.1932 17.6.1932
|
Sir Henry Edward Manning
|
18.6.1932 16.5.1941
|
Clarence Edward Martin
|
16.5.1941 23.2.1953
|
William Francis Sheahan
|
23.2.1953 15.3.1956
|
Robert Reginald Downing
|
15.3.1956 13.5.1965
|
Sir Kenneth Malcolm McCaw
|
13.5.1965 3.1.1975
|
John Clarkson Maddison
|
3.1.1975 14.5.1976
|
Francis (Frank) John Walker
|
14.5.1976 1.2.1983
|
Paul Landa
|
1.2.1983 24.11.1984
|
Neville Kenneth Wran
|
27.11.1984 12.12.1984
|
Terence William Sheahan
|
12.12.1984 26.11.1987
|
Ronald Joseph Mulock
|
26.11.1987 25.3.1988
|
John Robert Arthur Dowd
|
25.3.1988 6.6.1991
|
Peter Edward James Collins
|
6.6.1991 3.7.1992
|
John Planta Hannaford
|
3.7.1992 4.4.1995
|
Jeffrey William Shaw
|
4.4.1995 28.6.2000
|
Robert (Bob) John Debus
|
28.6.2000 2.4.2007
|
John Hatzistergos
|
2.4.2007 28.3.2011
|
Gregory (Greg) Eugene Smith |
3.4.2011 - 17.4.2014 |
Bradley (Brad) Ronald Hazzard |
23.4.2014 - 2.4.2015 |
Gabrielle Cecelia Upton |
2.4.2015 - 30.1.2017 |
Mark Raymond Speakman |
30.1.2017 - 28.3.2023 |
Michael John Daley |
28.3.2023- |